Hewson, Gillian Louise (CPSO#: 98820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Block Line Medical Clinic
1450 Block Line Road
Suite 201
Kitchener ON  N2C 0A5
Phone: (519) 578-4450
Fax: (519) 579-1142
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gillian Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hewson ( CPSO# 98820 )

Business Address:
Block Line Medical Clinic
201 - 1450 Block Line Road
Kitchener ON  M2C 0A5
Phone Number: (519) 578-4450

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN LOUISE HEWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014