Heydari, Bobak (CPSO#: 84516)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences North 41 Ramsey Lake Rd Sudbury ON ON P3E 5J1
Date Received: 24 Jul 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2017