Heyding, Robert Andrew (CPSO#: 101605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4G 4E4
Phone: 4164243145
Fax: 4164242611
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - New York

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Robert  Andrew Heyding may practise medicine independently in primary care
            medicine, excluding paediatrics, obstetrics and gynaecology, only.