Heyland, Daren Keith (CPSO#: 61275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Watkins 5
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6051
Fax: (613) 548-2428
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daren Heyland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heyland ( CPSO# 61275 )

Business Address:
Watkins 5
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6051

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAREN KEITH HEYLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1991