Hibbert, Nadira Deandra (CPSO#: 89177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-420 BRONTE STREET SOUTH
Milton ON  L9T 0H9
Phone: 905-636-6608
Fax: 905-636-6615
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 ALBERT STREET
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: 705-746-4540
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

700 ROSS AVENUE EAST
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hibbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hibbert ( CPSO# 89177 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Milton Lung Clinic
101 - 420 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 636-6608

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIRA DEANDRA HIBBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIBBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2013 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013