Hick, Anthony Michael Sampson (CPSO#: 59657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4733
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Hick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hick ( CPSO# 59657 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY MICHAEL SAMPSON HICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989