Hicken, Gary James (CPSO#: 68537)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Birmingham, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1996