Hickling, Duane Ross (CPSO#: 82731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Division of Urology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4500
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hickling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hickling ( CPSO# 82731 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B- 327
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUANE ROSS HICKLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013