Hickman, Robert Stanley (CPSO#: 26031)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010