Hicks, Lawren Stanley (CPSO#: 30160)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 2002