Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hicks, Lisa Kathryn (CPSO#: 63656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
380 Burnham Street
Suite 105
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 741-3489
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA KATHRYN HICKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Jan 1994 to 10 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993