Hicks, Rebecca Anne (CPSO#: 106428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE HICKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2017