Hicks, Susan Barbara (CPSO#: 50717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Conroy Medical Centre
Unit 100
2 Lorry Greenberg Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 5H6
Phone: (613) 737-0654
Fax: (613) 737-3265
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan B. Hicks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hicks ( CPSO# 50717 )

Business Address:
Conroy Medical Centre
Suite 100
2 Larry Greenberg Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 5H6
Phone Number: (613) 737-0654

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN BARBARA HICKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1984