Hicks, Todd Douglas (CPSO#: 65464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone: (905) 727-1711
Fax: (905) 727-1411
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Todd D. Hicks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hicks ( CPSO# 65464 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 727-1711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD DOUGLAS HICKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993