Hidvegi, Sylvia (CPSO#: 60070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Service
1800 8th Street East, room 4219
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121 Ext. 2489
Fax: 519-372-3945
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

459 Hume st.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: 705-444-6600
Fax: 705-444-5131
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvia Hidvegi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hidvegi ( CPSO# 60070 )

Business Address:
Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 408
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 551-1900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA HIDVEGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIDVEGI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989