Hiebert, Clement Arthur (CPSO#: 54883)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 1991