Hiemstra, Robert Dennis (CPSO#: 70573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Noxon Street
2nd Floor
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-9617
Fax: (519) 485-9620
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Office of the Chief Coroner
Southwest Region
303-235 North Centre Rd.
London ON  N5X 4E7
Canada
Phone: (519) 661-6617
Fax: (519) 453-4306
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Hiemstra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hiemstra ( CPSO# 70573 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-9617

Business Address:
303 - 235 North Centre Road
London ON  N5X 4E7
Phone Number: (519) 661-6624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DENNIS HIEMSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIEMSTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998