Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hierlihy, Phyllis Jane (CPSO#: 23106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1919 Riverside Drive
Suite 404
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 860-3632
Fax: (613) 569-0889
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital, Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr. Ottawa, Ont.
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd.
Ottawa, Ont.
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.J. Hierlihy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hierlihy ( CPSO# 23106 )

Business Address:
The Riverside Professional Centre
404 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 860-3632

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHYLLIS JANE HIERLIHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIERLIHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1970