Higgins, Darren Scott (CPSO#: 62267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 972-6019
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8765
Fax: (416) 586-5970
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centre for Mindfulness Studies
180 Sudbury St.
Toronto ON  M6J 0A8
Canada
Phone: (647) 524-6216
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darren Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Higgins ( CPSO# 62267 )

Business Address:
201 - 720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 972-6019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN SCOTT HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991