Higgins, Greg Arthur (CPSO#: 58569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-0400 Ext. 1
Fax: (888) 219-1248
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Greg Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Higgins ( CPSO# 58569 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-0400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREG ARTHUR HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1988