Higgins, Louise Jane (CPSO#: 75132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

177 TIE ROAD
Tiverton ON  N0G 2T0
Canada
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Higgins ( CPSO# 75132 )

Business Address:
Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-9940

Business Address:
Bruce Power
177 Tie Road
Tiverton ON  N0G 2T0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE JANE HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002