Higgins, Patrick Peter (CPSO#: 73217)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 05 May 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2000