Higgins, Ursula Corinna (CPSO#: 55837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Names: Glackin, Ursula Corinna (used until: 07 May 2003 )     Glackin, Ursula Corinna (used until: 30 May 1991 )     Glackin, Ursula Corinna (used until: 21 Jul 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. URSULA CORINNA HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1986