Higginson, Lyall Arthur James (CPSO#: 29119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room H3412A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7278
Fax: (613) 696-7127
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lyall Higginson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Higginson ( CPSO# 29119 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Unit H3412A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4039

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYALL ARTHUR JAMES HIGGINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977