Higgs, Stewart Ian Llewellyn (CPSO#: 83626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Thomas's Hospital Medical School, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Lower Simcoe
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone: (416) 504-0628
Fax: (416) 504-2009
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.I.L. Higgs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Samir Antowan Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre Unit B 5 360 Dundas Street East Oakville Ontario L6H 6Z9 Tel: (905) 257-8777 Fax: (905) 257-0437
Date Received: 19 Dec 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEWART IAN LLEWELLYN HIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2005