Highmore, Kerri Ann (CPSO#: 96336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Childrens Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3709
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kerri Highmore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Highmore ( CPSO# 96336 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Radiology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRI ANN HIGHMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGHMORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012