Hii, Anthony You Ping (CPSO#: 25574)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1 888 563 3732 www.GetMyMedRecord.ca
Date Received: 13 Nov 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2016