Hildebrand, Anne Marie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 700
1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M4W 3R1
Phone: (416) 762-3939
Fax: (416) 762-3939
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE ELIZABETH HILDEBRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILDEBRAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008