Hildebrand, Kevin Arnold (CPSO#: 71062)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1998