Hildes Ripstein, Gertrude Elizabeth Elske (CPSO#: 65906)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Hildes, Gertrude Elizabeth Elske (used until: 21 Jan 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1995