Hill, Amanda Jane (CPSO#: 55261)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991