Hill, Andrew Beverly (CPSO#: 64930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Vascular Surgery
A280-014
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew B. Hill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hill ( CPSO# 64930 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Vascular Surgery
A280-014
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW BEVERLY HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1992