Hill, James Thomas (CPSO#: 43446)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1990