Hill, Mariana Georgeta (CPSO#: 50137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: Benoist, Mariana Georgeta (used until: 15 Apr 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103 - 2221 Keele Street
North York ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: 416-614-9696
Fax: 416-960-1017
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6660
Fax: (416) 756-6731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANA GEORGETA HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1985