Hill, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 53718)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 14 Oct 1988
Summary:

 The Fitness to Practise Committee finds that Dr. Hill is an incapacitated member of the College of 
 Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 62(1)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act.  
 

The Fitness to Practise Committee orders the following as a term and condition of Dr. Hill(s 
 licence:

1.	that he undergo treatment with a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar who shall 
 file quarterly reports to the College;

2.	that he be monitored by a colleague licensed with the 
 College and acceptable to the Registrar, who shall file yearly reports to the College.

The 
 Fitness to Practice Committee orders and directs the Registrar to remove from the Certificate of 
 Registration of Dr. Michael A. Hill the terms, limitations and conditions imposed by the Order of 
 the Fitness to Practice Committee made on October 14, 1988.

Appeal: No Appeal