Hill, Michael Douglas (CPSO#: 66659)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016