Hill, Robert Justin (CPSO#: 33841)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1990