Hillier, Linda Gail (CPSO#: 50721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2382
Fax: (613) 738-4297
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA GAIL HILLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILLIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1996