Hillis, Joanne Patricia (CPSO#: 55284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Kavanagh, Joanne Patricia (used until: 15 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Sep 1990