Hillyer, Cheryl Ann (CPSO#: 67685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5S8
Phone: (519) 271-2822
Fax: (519) 271-2266
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl Hillyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hillyer ( CPSO# 67685 )

Business Address:
150 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5S8
Phone Number: (519) 271-2822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL ANN HILLYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILLYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996