Hilton, James Douglas (CPSO#: 23515)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3 Canada Toll Free: 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 647 933 2904 http://recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017