Hilton, John Frederick (CPSO#: 82719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Hilton, John Frederick Dobson (used until: 27 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Irving Greenberg Family Cancer
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Hilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hilton ( CPSO# 82719 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK HILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009