Hilwah, Mahmoud Mustafa Mahmoud (CPSO#: 108407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E3 640
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196633976
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD MUSTAFA MAHMOUD HILWAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HILWAH is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. HILWAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HILWAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HILWAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HILWAH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HILWAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2016 to 24 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017