Himann, Joan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 743-3804
Fax: (705) 872-4357
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 302
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 741-1191
Fax: (705) 741-1192
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joan Himann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Himann ( CPSO# 62572 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 743-3804

Business Address:
PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN ELIZABETH HIMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1991