Himel, Calvin (CPSO#: 17060)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1958 to 24 Jun 1959
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2010