Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Himidan, Sharifa Abdallah (CPSO#: 66165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6357
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharifa Himidan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Himidan ( CPSO# 66165 )

Business Address:
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6357

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Paediatric Suites
4001 Leslie Street 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6223


Corporation Name: Himidan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Himidan ( CPSO# 66165 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6357

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
3rd Floor
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6223


Corporation Name: Dr. Augusto Zani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Himidan ( CPSO# 66165 )
Dr. E. Zani-Ruttenstock ( CPSO# 104974)
Dr. A. Zani ( CPSO# 104505)

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General & Thoracic Surgery
1526-555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 508-0245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Jan 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARIFA ABDALLAH HIMIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIMIDAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 11 Jan 1994
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1994 to 11 Jan 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1995 to 11 Jan 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1996 to 11 Jan 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005