Hindieh, Waseem Hekmat (CPSO#: 96583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASEEM HEKMAT HINDIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINDIEH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016