Hindle, Mark Thomas (CPSO#: 93591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Ext. 2100
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Hindle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hindle ( CPSO# 93591 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK THOMAS HINDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINDLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

McMaster University, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016