Hindmarsh, Carol (CPSO#: 24478)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Names: Hindmarsh-Clark, Carol (used until: 20 Sep 1987 )     Clark, Carol Hindmarsh (used until: 18 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000