Hinds, Llynda Mary (CPSO#: 24324)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Women's Medical College of Pennsylvania, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2011